This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 16:39:40 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS SPINDELL, CRYSTAL

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SPINDELL, CRYSTAL. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Madison County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

SPINDELL, CRYSTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

12/02/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

NOTICE

12/02/2019:NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

12/02/2019:SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/02/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/7/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019013738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 402019SC000361SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/07/2020 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MX COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less