This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 07/14/2019 15:35:46

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HE against THE ESTATE OF SIDNEY CONNER AS in the jurisdiction of Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Third Circuit Courts - Madison County
  • Judge OLIN, MELISSA G
  • Courthouse Madison County Courthouse
  • County Madison
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant THE ESTATE OF SIDNEY CONNER AS
  • Represented By
    • SCHNITKER, CLAY ALAN
  • Plaintiff STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HE
  • Represented By
    • BRUNER, JAMES HAMILTON KERR

Court Documents

ISSUED SUMMONS

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS

Free with Subscription
DEF'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

06/21/2019:DEF'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Free with Subscription
CONTRACTS & INDEBTEDNESS COMPLAINT

06/14/2019:CONTRACTS & INDEBTEDNESS COMPLAINT

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • DEF'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS
  • 06/14/2019
  • CONTRACTS & INDEBTEDNESS COMPLAINT
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019CA000058CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.