This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 07/14/2019 15:35:29

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Other case was filed by SEAGO, EARL against COHEN, KATHLEEN in the jurisdiction of Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Third Circuit Courts - Madison County
  • Judge OLIN, MELISSA G
  • Courthouse Madison County Courthouse
  • County Madison
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff SEAGO, EARL
  • Represented By
    • SCHNITKER, CLAY ALAN
  • Defendant MCKINNEY, EVELYN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff SEAGO, ROBERTA
  • Represented By
    • SCHNITKER, CLAY ALAN
  • Defendant SCOTT, RUTH S
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MCCASKILL, DOROTHY K
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MOORE, JUAN A
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MOORE, VICTOR C
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant SHEPPARD, JOHN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant COHEN, KATHLEEN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MOORE, CHARLIE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE DOROTHY KEYS MCCASKILL

06/28/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE DOROTHY KEYS MCCASKILL

Free with Subscription
NTC OF LIS PENDENS

06/14/2019:NTC OF LIS PENDENS

Free with Subscription
ISSUED SUMMONS VICTOR C MOORE

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS VICTOR C MOORE

Free with Subscription
ISSUED SUMMONS JUAN MOORE

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS JUAN MOORE

Free with Subscription
ISSUED SUMMONS DOROTHY MCCASKILL

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS DOROTHY MCCASKILL

Free with Subscription
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

06/14/2019:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • AFFD OF SERVICE VICTOR MOORE
  • 07/11/2019
  • ANSWER OF JUAN A MOORE
  • 07/08/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 7/8/2019
  • 07/03/2019
  • AFFD OF SERVICE
  • 06/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE DOROTHY KEYS MCCASKILL
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006719
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS VICTOR C MOORE
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS JUAN MOORE
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS DOROTHY MCCASKILL
  • 06/14/2019
  • NTC OF LIS PENDENS
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019CA000057CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.