This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 18:28:07 (UTC).

RAGANS, JIMMIE VS CHERRY, YOLANDA

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 RAGANS, JIMMIE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CHERRY, YOLANDA. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAGANS, JIMMIE

Defendant

CHERRY, YOLANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF EVICTION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (TENANT EVICTION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketReceipt Copy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006232

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $40.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase 402020CC000176EVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less