This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:51:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS ROMIE, CASSANDRA J

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROMIE, CASSANDRA J. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

ROMIE, CASSANDRA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

01/18/2021:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

01/04/2021:DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

12/09/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/09/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/09/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020009844

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000275SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ