This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 10/01/2021 at 15:38:22 (UTC).

POIRE, ALBERT VS KNIGHT, JEFFRY

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 POIRE, ALBERT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KNIGHT, JEFFRY. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POIRE, ALBERT

Defendant

KNIGHT, JEFFRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORHEAD, TIMOTHY RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

BASS, KYLE D.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

09/03/2021:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

09/03/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

ISSUED SUMMONS

09/03/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS

THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

09/03/2021:THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAIN

09/28/2021:DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CA000039CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KYLE D BASS, ESQ