This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:51:02 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SMITH, SAMMIE

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, SAMMIE. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SMITH, SAMMIE

Madison, FL 32340-4365

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/15/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/15/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2020010019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000282SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL