This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:50:54 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS NEIL, CHERRIE

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEIL, CHERRIE. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NEIL, CHERRIE

Lee, FL 32059-0265

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/04/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

12/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020010100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000285SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL