This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:14:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MCDANIEL, SHALONDA

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCDANIEL, SHALONDA. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MCDANIEL, SHALONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

12/21/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

12/11/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

11/30/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ISSUED SUMMONS

11/30/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/30/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2020009557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000264SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B