This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 16:42:00 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JACKSON, HOWARD

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACKSON, HOWARD. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III, E BROWNING III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

E BROWNING III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JACKSON, HOWARD

Pinetta, FL 32350-2249

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/15/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ISSUED SUMMONS

10/15/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE - 10-26-2021

11/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - 10-26-2021

RETURN OF SERVICE

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/07/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - 10-26-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketReceipt Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 12/7/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase 402021SC000267SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW