Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 03/05/2021 at 15:35:33 (UTC).

JOHNSON, SYLVIA VS MADISON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 JOHNSON, SYLVIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MADISON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Madison County

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, SYLVIA

Defendant

MADISON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEARY, RYAN ALAN

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/12/2021:PETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

02/12/2021:FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

02/12/2021:COMPLAINT

ISSUED SUMMONS SHRILEY JOSEPH

02/12/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS SHRILEY JOSEPH

ISSUED SUMMONS FLORIDA DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVCS FOR MCSB

02/12/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS FLORIDA DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVCS FOR MCSB

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021001006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS SHRILEY JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS FLORIDA DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVCS FOR MCSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CA000010CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN A YEARY