This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 16:59:49 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS WOOD, ALAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOOD, ALAN. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

WOOD, THEODORA

WOOD, ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FICKER, CHRISTINE MARY

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/29/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ISSUED SUMMONS

05/29/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

ISSUED SUMMONS

05/29/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER CANCELLING MEDIATION AND PRE-TRIALS

07/07/2020:ORDER CANCELLING MEDIATION AND PRE-TRIALS

RETURN OF SERVICE

07/08/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

07/08/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

ALIAS SUMMONS

08/25/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS

Receipt Copy

08/25/2020:Receipt Copy

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/16/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/21/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

10/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

10/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE

10/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/22/2020 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 10/22/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt Copy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 2020006885

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 7/14/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 2020004947

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000144SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FICKER, CHRISTINE MARY