This case was last updated from Madison County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 05/23/2022 at 05:06:10 (UTC).

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC VS B, S

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against B, S. This case was filed in Madison County - Third Judicial Circuit Court, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA G, MELISSA OLIN and OLIN, MELISSA GATES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC

Defendant

B, S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

FILED COMPLAINT

09/10/2021:FILED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING & NOT OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

09/24/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING & NOT OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/15/2021 09:00; Judge: OLIN, MELISSA G; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 10/15/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results CANCELLED on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 10/15/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING & NOT OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CA000041CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J. G. Wentworth Originations LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petitt, Richard Thomas