This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:15:26 (UTC).

HUGHES, SONJA B VS HUGHES, GREGORY B

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 HUGHES, SONJA B filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUGHES, GREGORY B. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, MELISSA OLIN and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUGHES, SONJA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY WADE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 5/24/2021 0200 PM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 5/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L. BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 5/24/2021 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AGREED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST GREGORY B HUGHES DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ON GREGORY B HUGHES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000551

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase 402021DR000012DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAUNCEY ESQUIRE, ANTHONY W