This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 01/13/2021 at 17:34:15 (UTC).

GRAHAM, PASHON VS WEATHERSPOON, KENDRICK

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 GRAHAM, PASHON filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against WEATHERSPOON, KENDRICK. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DECKER, ANDREW and ANDREW DECKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DECKER, ANDREW

ANDREW DECKER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRAHAM, PASHON

Respondent

WEATHERSPOON, KENDRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketJudge: HEARING , OFFICER Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Filed date changed to 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 2/2/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:HEARING set for 2/2/2021 at 0830 AM in MX with Judge OFFICER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 2/2/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:HEARING set for 2/2/2021 at 0830 AM in MX with Judge OFFICER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 2/2/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE KENDRICK WEATHERSPOON

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketReopened for OTHER on 11/4/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketFINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMIN SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketCase 402015DR000054DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketJudge: DECKER , ANDREW assigned

    Read MoreRead Less