This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 09/28/2022 at 05:23:30 (UTC).

FL DEPT OF REVENUE OBO JADA WI VS BRADY, BRITTANY MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 FL DEPT OF REVENUE OBO JADA WI filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against BRADY, BRITTANY MARIE. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FL DEPT OF REVENUE OBO JADA WI

Defendant

BRADY, BRITTANY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketRETURNED SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketActive Process WRIT disposition on 8/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER RESCINDING WRIT OF BDILY ATTACHMENT ENTERED 8/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketActive Process WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 8/2/2022 0930 AM Judge OFFICER HEARING results Disposed on 8/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF C.S HEARING OFFICER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCLERK NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 8/2/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS: SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDOR- DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase 402021DR000007DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A