This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 07/14/2019 14:32:25

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Other case was filed by DISCOVER BANK against SAMPSON, VERNDELL in the jurisdiction of Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Madison County Courts
  • Judge BROWNING, E BAILEY III
  • Courthouse Madison County Courthouse
  • County Madison
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK
  • Represented By
    • CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.
  • Defendant SAMPSON, VERNDELL
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICES-SERVED 06/22/19

07/01/2019:RETURN OF SERVICES-SERVED 06/22/19

Free with Subscription
ISSUED SUMMONS

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS

Free with Subscription
COMPLAINT

06/14/2019:COMPLAINT

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • ANSWER
  • 07/01/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICES-SERVED 06/22/19
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006696
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019CC000188CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.