This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:15:20 (UTC).

DEMPS, ASHLEY NICOLE VS DEMPS, JEREMY ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 DEMPS, ASHLEY NICOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DEMPS, JEREMY ANTONIO. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, MELISSA OLIN and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEMPS, ASHLEY NICOLE

Respondent

DEMPS, JEREMY ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 4/13/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 5/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER DIMISSING PET BY AFF FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR VIOLATION OF FJ OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DV WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketActive Process NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 4/13/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & SCHEDULING HRG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPETITION BY AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURIS/ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOMESTIC INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase 402021DR000013DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less