This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 22:43:10 (UTC).

CURTIS, MICHAEL JACOB NATALE

Case Summary

On 12/13/2020 CURTIS, MICHAEL JACOB NATALE was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, OLIN, MELISSA G and MELISSA OLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURTIS, MICHAEL JACOB NATALE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/9/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HRG VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (NOT ENTERED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF ADULT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketCase 402020DR000224DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less