This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:15:13 (UTC).

COOPER, MARGARET ANN VS COOPER, MICHAEL WADE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 COOPER, MARGARET ANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COOPER, MICHAEL WADE. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, MELISSA OLIN and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, MARGARET ANN

Defendant

COOPER, MICHAEL WADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEETING, JENNIFER LEIGH

Defendant Attorney

ADAMSON, KRISTIN K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketJOINT MOTION TO BIFURCATE TO DISSOLVE THE MARRIAGE RESERVING ON REMAINING ISSUES & JOINT MOT TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SERVE 3RD PARTY SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S AMENDED NOT TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S HUSBAND'S NOTICE TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEvent NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 6/2/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEvent NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 6/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO HUSBAND'S 2ND REQ FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 10/22/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 10/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS disposition on 2/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000636

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase 402021DR000014DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMSON, KRISTIN K.