This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:15:35 (UTC).

BUCHANAN, EMILY B VS BUCHANAN, KENNETH BRANDON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 BUCHANAN, EMILY B filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BUCHANAN, KENNETH BRANDON. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, OLIN, MELISSA G and MELISSA OLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUCHANAN, EMILY B

Respondent

BUCHANAN, KENNETH BRANDON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 6/8/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 6/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 6/8/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 4/13/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results CASE CONTINUED NEXT on 5/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 4/13/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION HERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L. HIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L. HERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS disposition on 1/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase 402021DR000011DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less