This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:15:08 (UTC).

BOWMAN, CAROL ANN, MATHIS, DANIEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 BOWMAN, CAROL ANN, MATHIS, DANIEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATHIS, DANIEL

Not Classified By Court

MATHIS, DEWAYNE

Decedent

BOWMAN, CAROL ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH, WALTER CRIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORDER TO DETERMINING HOMESTEAD REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJOINDER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000393

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CP000007CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, WALTER CRIT