This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 19:47:12 (UTC).

BOSTICK, CASSANDRA N, MORGAN, DANIEL J Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2020 BOSTICK, CASSANDRA N, MORGAN, DANIEL J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MORGAN, DANIEL J

BOSTICK, CASSANDRA N

Decedent

NESBITT, LILLIE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KELLEY, CHRISTOPHER P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY FOR ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020010020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT REGARDING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RECORDING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY FOR ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketCase 402020CP000140CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Christopher P