This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 22:44:00 (UTC).

BLAKELY, HEATHER VS BLAKELY, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 BLAKELY, HEATHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BLAKELY, CHARLES. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, OLIN, MELISSA G and MELISSA OLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLAKELY, HEATHER

Respondent

BLAKELY, CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM HAMILTON COUNTY ACCEPTING ORIGINAL FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO HAMILTON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE (TRANSFERRING FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 12/22/2020 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results CASE CONTINUED NEXT on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF ASSIGNMENT CONSOLIDATED WITH HAMILTON COUNTY CASE NO. 20-252-DR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketActive Process TEMPORARY ORDER & SCHEDULING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RECEIPT TO HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION ORDER SCHEDULING HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOMESTIC INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase 402020DR000216DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

    Read MoreRead Less