This case was last updated from Madison County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:07:11 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS JENKINS, NONDIS P

Case Summary

On 01/16/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JENKINS, NONDIS P. This case was filed in Madison County Florida Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III, E BROWNING III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

E BROWNING III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

JENKINS, NONDIS P

Greenville, FL 32331

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/16/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ISSUED SUMMONS

01/16/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/16/2021:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

01/16/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

02/09/2021:STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMEMT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

03/23/2021:MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMEMT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMEMT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/09/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 2/9/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000407

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketCase 402021SC000009SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B