This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 18:27:28 (UTC).

ATKINSON, HORACE JR, ATKINSON, HORACE JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 ATKINSON, HORACE JR, ATKINSON, HORACE JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Madison County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

ATKINSON, HORACE JR

Decedent

ATKINSON, JOSEPH WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

WAKEMAN, MARY LALLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY AND PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2019013797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Case 402019CP000118CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.