This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:51:31 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS WILLIAMS, RAY SR

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, RAY SR. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

WILLIAMS, RAY SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DISALLE, LISA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

12/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

12/28/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/09/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

12/09/2020:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020009869

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000277SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DISALLE , LISA