This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 17:32:51 (UTC).

AKINS, JASMINE RENEE VS AKINS, DALLAS MARLO

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 AKINS, JASMINE RENEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AKINS, DALLAS MARLO. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Madison County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AKINS, JASMINE RENEE

Respondent

AKINS, DALLAS MARLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS disposition on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 402019DR000258DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

    Read MoreRead Less