This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/27/2023 at 16:00:29 (UTC).

YARITZA ZAPATA TORRES

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 YARITZA ZAPATA TORRES was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendant

YARITZA ZAPATA TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/17/2023 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/17/2023 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/17/2023 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/17/2023 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

CASH BOND FILED

01/18/2023 - CASH BOND FILED

CASH BOND FILED

01/18/2023 - CASH BOND FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, FILED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE

01/24/2023 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, FILED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE

WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANTS APPEARANCE FOR ALL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

01/24/2023 - WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANTS APPEARANCE FOR ALL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY' S UNAVAILABILITY

03/08/2023 - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY' S UNAVAILABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION- ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; BURGLARY OF AN OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE- DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ATTORNEY' S UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event CRARRNFO on 2/24/2023 0900 AM Judge LON AREND results HEARING HELD on 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANTS APPEARANCE FOR ALL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, FILED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $8,000.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1107311; Tender Amount: $8,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1107311

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $500.00 AssessmentID 12024969

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $7,500.00 AssessmentID 12024966

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent CRARRNFO scheduled on 2/24/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge LON AREND presiding. EventID 1500639

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CF000129CFAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • ChargeStatus: 810.02.1; Description: BURGLARY OF OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE; Degree: Second Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE; Degree: First Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less