This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/07/2020 at 09:51:19 (UTC).

WADE L CHEUSDE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 WADE L CHEUSDE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

WADE L CHEUSDE

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/06/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

03/06/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/03/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/28/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COPY)

02/27/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COPY)

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/27/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

BENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

02/27/2020 - BENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

E-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

02/24/2020 - E-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

02/20/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Hearing03/06/2020 at 08:30AM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-B; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY JOSHUA MILLER, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY DEANNA CIPRIANO PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED IN THE COUNTY JAIL MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE RENEE INMAN ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: FAILURE TO APPEAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BENCH WARRANT ORDERED BOND SET AT $250.00 BOND ESTREATURE ORDERED/ROR/SROR REVOKED JUDGE RENEE INMAN ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 999.9999.9999; Description: POSSESSION ALC W/IN 300 FT OF ESTABLISH; Degree: N/A;

    Read MoreRead Less