This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 13:23:28 (UTC).

THOMAS CHRISTOPHER RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 THOMAS CHRISTOPHER RODRIGUEZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

THOMAS CHRISTOPHER RODRIGUEZ

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM MATTHEW KOWTKO

Other Attorneys

LIMEECHA SHIREE DUNBAR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

08/11/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

08/11/2020 - MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

AMENDED INFORMATION FILED

08/05/2020 - AMENDED INFORMATION FILED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/29/2020 AT 08:30 AM

07/21/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/29/2020 AT 08:30 AM

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT JULY 21ST, 2020 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

07/20/2020 - WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT JULY 21ST, 2020 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE- PRINTED

04/17/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE- PRINTED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/28/2020 AT 01:25 PM

03/31/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/28/2020 AT 01:25 PM

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

03/26/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/23/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3-31-2020 AT 1:25 PM

03/04/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3-31-2020 AT 1:25 PM

CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

02/21/2020 - CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MATTHEW KOWTKO, ESQUIRE

02/20/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MATTHEW KOWTKO, ESQUIRE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

INFORMATION FILED

02/12/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Hearing09/29/2020 at 08:30AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-B; Judge: SINGER, MARK D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Hearing09/14/2020 at 01:25PM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket***AMENDED INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/29/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT JULY 21ST, 2020 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • Hearing03/04/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Hearing03/04/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD- PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3-31-2020 AT 1:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MATTHEW KOWTKO, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketE-SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less