This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 04:39:54 (UTC).

SHANNA K WILSON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SHANNA K WILSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendant

SHANNA K WILSON

Nokomis, FL 34275

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCOTT BRADLEY CALLIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

06/16/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

06/08/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

04/28/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/31/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

03/11/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED

03/03/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

02/21/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

02/11/2020 - STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

02/11/2020 - STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

BUD'S BAIL BOD; ACC; $7500.00 / 1500.00

02/06/2020 - BUD'S BAIL BOD; ACC; $7500.00 / 1500.00

SASASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY (SECOND PAGE IS BLANK)

02/05/2020 - SASASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY (SECOND PAGE IS BLANK)

(2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

01/24/2020 - (2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2 COUNTS)

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2 COUNTS)

ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

01/22/2020 - ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • Hearing07/17/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Hearing06/19/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Hearing06/05/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCOURT RESETS CASE FOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 06/19/2020 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Hearing05/01/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT ASKING FOR A NEW COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUD'S BAIL BOD; ACC; $7500.00 / 1500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSASASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY (SECOND PAGE IS BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2 COUNTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 539.001.8b8a; Description: OBTAINING MONEY FROM PAWN BROKER BY FRAUD (LESS THAN $300); Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.019.1; Description: DEALING IN STOLEN PROPERTY; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less