This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 12:30:28 (UTC).

SEAN THOMAS PALLADAY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 SEAN THOMAS PALLADAY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********12AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Defendant

SEAN THOMAS PALLADAY

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAMIEN JOSEPH BYTHROW

Other Attorneys

GREGORY T HREBINKO

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

01/24/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

01/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

01/22/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING ( PLEA CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 1:30 PM)

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING ( PLEA CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 1:30 PM)

INFORMATION

01/16/2020 - INFORMATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/14/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/13/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/10/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER- IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/10/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER- IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

BRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT / MANATEE COUNTY - VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

01/10/2020 - BRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT / MANATEE COUNTY - VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearing02/10/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearing02/10/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Hearing01/24/2020 at 01:30PM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-B; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY JOSHUA MILLER, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY GREGORY HREBINKO PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED IN THE COUNTY JAIL MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE HEATHER DOYLE ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( PLEA CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 1:30 PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER- IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT / MANATEE COUNTY - VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.1a2a; Description: TRESPASS AFTER NOTICE ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less