This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/07/2020 at 07:43:37 (UTC).

SANTIAGO RUIZ

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SANTIAGO RUIZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendants

SANTIAGO RUIZ

Bradenton, FL 34203

SANTIAGO MOJOICA RUIZ

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ALLANAH LOUISE MCCLINTOCK

LAYRON JAMIE GAITHER

STEVE DANIEL SANTIAGO

Other Attorneys

JAMES CHARLES SIEGFREID

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

03/05/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

STIPULATION/ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 7/15/2020 AT 9:00AM AND JURY TRIAL SET FOR 7/27/2020

03/03/2020 - STIPULATION/ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 7/15/2020 AT 9:00AM AND JURY TRIAL SET FOR 7/27/2020

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

02/12/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

SWORN MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF PARTIAL INDIGENY FOR COSTS AND INVESTIGATION

03/03/2020 - SWORN MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF PARTIAL INDIGENY FOR COSTS AND INVESTIGATION

NOTICE OF HEARING; BOND HEARING; 02/05/2020 9:00 AM

01/27/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING; BOND HEARING; 02/05/2020 9:00 AM

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

03/05/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S PRO SE NOTICE

02/19/2020 - ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S PRO SE NOTICE

VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

01/22/2020 - VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

ORDER - STEVE SANTIAGO, ESQUIRE IS NO ATTORNEY OF RECORD

03/04/2020 - ORDER - STEVE SANTIAGO, ESQUIRE IS NO ATTORNEY OF RECORD

INFORMATION FILED

01/31/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/10/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

01/27/2020 - MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED STEVE SANTIAGO, ESQUIRE

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED STEVE SANTIAGO, ESQUIRE

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/23/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/10/2020 AT 8:30AM

02/14/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/10/2020 AT 8:30AM

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • Hearing07/27/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Hearing07/15/2020 at 09:00AM - JAIL DEFENDANTS DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Hearing03/10/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STEVE SANTIAGO, ESQUIRE IS NO ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION/ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 7/15/2020 AT 9:00AM AND JURY TRIAL SET FOR 7/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; BOND HEARING; 02/05/2020 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.045.1b; Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY (PREGNANT WOMAN); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less