This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 04:05:46 (UTC).

SAHER ALKAYYAL KADER, STATE OF FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SAHER ALKAYYAL KADER, STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

SAHER ALKAYYAL KADER

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Howard L Dimmig II

Appellee Attorney

Ashley Brook Moody

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

05/06/2020 - SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, MAILEDTO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

03/13/2020 - RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, MAILEDTO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAMENDED TRANSCRIPTS SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND MAILED TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF RECORD ON APPEAL SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, MAILEDTO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCLERK NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEAL SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY TO THE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less