This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 14:34:42 (UTC).

ROY APOLINAR

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 ROY APOLINAR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********07AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROY APOLINAR

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

ALLANAH LOUISE MCCLINTOCK

Other Attorneys

TANNER WOODS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 8/13/2020 @ 830AM 8-A

07/16/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 8/13/2020 @ 830AM 8-A

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 08/13/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A

07/16/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 08/13/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

06/17/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - SET FOR 07/16/2020 AT 8:30 AM

06/16/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - SET FOR 07/16/2020 AT 8:30 AM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE -PRINTED

05/14/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE -PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

04/06/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/19/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

03/09/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

03/09/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/19/2020 AT 8:30AM

03/06/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/19/2020 AT 8:30AM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/28/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

INFORMATION

02/27/2020 - INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/10/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

BAD BOY BAIL BONDS; RSCCI; $1,500.00 (2)

02/10/2020 - BAD BOY BAIL BONDS; RSCCI; $1,500.00 (2)

FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

02/10/2020 - FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • Hearing08/13/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Hearing07/16/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 8/13/2020 @ 830AM 8-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 08/13/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - SET FOR 07/16/2020 AT 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE -PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCOURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAD BOY BAIL BONDS; RSCCI; $1,500.00 (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 322.34.2c; Description: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED (WITH KNOWLEDGE - THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE); Degree: Third Degree; Citation: ADCTXSE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.6a; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less