This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 07:48:31 (UTC).

ROGER L ROBERTSON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ROGER L ROBERTSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********72AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROGER L ROBERTSON

Bradenton, FL 34205

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

02/19/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

02/19/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAIVES COUNSEL STATE REPRESENTED BY DEANNA CIPRIANO PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDICATION WITHHELD MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE RENEE INMAN ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 999.9999.9999; Description: POSSESSION ALC W/IN 300 FT OF ESTABLISH; Degree: N/A;

    Read MoreRead Less