This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 09:00:21 (UTC).

ROBERT S CLEVENSTINE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 ROBERT S CLEVENSTINE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERT S CLEVENSTINE

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

CARLY J ROBBINS-GILBERT

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/03/2020 AT 01:30 PM

07/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/03/2020 AT 01:30 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/09/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/23/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/03/2020 - STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/03/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/28/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 03/24/2020 AT 01:30 PM / PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

02/26/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 03/24/2020 AT 01:30 PM / PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/28/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • Hearing11/03/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/03/2020 AT 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Hearing04/21/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Hearing03/24/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 03/24/2020 AT 01:30 PM / PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13a; Description: PETIT/GRAND THEFT; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less