This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/22/2020 at 07:52:38 (UTC).

ROBERT JOSEPH DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ROBERT JOSEPH DAVIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERT JOSEPH DAVIS

Sarasota, FL 34243

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$160.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 806777; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$160.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 803498; Tender Amount: $150.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO DEFENDANT REGARDING $10 BALANCE DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCODE COMPLIANCE UNIFORM CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 999.9999.9999; Description: PERMIT REQUIRED; Degree: N/A;

    Read MoreRead Less