This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/27/2020 at 12:38:30 (UTC).

ROBERT DONALD COOK

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ROBERT DONALD COOK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERT DONALD COOK

Bradenton, FL 34207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

CARLY J ROBBINS-GILBERT

Other Attorneys

DEANNA MAY CIPRIANO

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:30 PM

07/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:30 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/09/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

01/31/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/23/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/26/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 03/24/2020 AT 01:30 PM

02/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 03/24/2020 AT 01:30 PM

AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS LLC (MANATEE), UFCIC, $500.00

02/24/2020 - AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS LLC (MANATEE), UFCIC, $500.00

INFORMATION

02/19/2020 - INFORMATION

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/19/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3513 - ORDER GIVEN TO CLERK OF COURT * *

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3513 - ORDER GIVEN TO CLERK OF COURT * *

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • Hearing08/11/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Hearing04/21/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Hearing03/24/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3513 - ORDER GIVEN TO CLERK OF COURT * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.12e; Description: PETIT THEFT ($100-$750); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less