This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/22/2020 at 07:52:34 (UTC).

ROBERT DONALD COOK

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ROBERT DONALD COOK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERT DONALD COOK

Bradenton, FL 34207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

02/21/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS~INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-SEE CASE #2020MM260A FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMARSY'S LAW - VICTIM'S RIGHT TO CONFIDENTIALITY FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2029 CF 3513 - ORDER GIVEN TO CLERK OF COURT * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less