This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 12:06:48 (UTC).

RALPH BROWN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 RALPH BROWN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILBERT A SMITH JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILBERT A SMITH JR

 

Party Details

Defendant

RALPH BROWN

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ALISON COSSETTI CLOUGH

Other Attorneys

JOSE MIGUEL HERRERO

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/02/2020 - JUDGMENT FILED- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

COMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

02/26/2020 - COMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

02/24/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

INFORMATION

01/28/2020 - INFORMATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/23/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION (SEE 2019CF3977)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNON-IMAGED COST WORKSHEET SEE CASE # 2019CF3977AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY KIERA FORLENZA, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER ON BEHALF OF ALISON CLOUGH, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY JOSE HERRERO PLED NOLO CONTENDERE, ADJUDGED GUILTY PLACED ON FRUG OFFENDER PROBATION FOR 36 MONTHS CONCURRENT WITH 2019 CF 3977 CREDIT TIME SERVED COUNTY JAIL 100 HOURS PUBLIC SERVICE WORK RECEIVE DRUG EVALUATION AND ENTER IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE TREATMENT AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE SUBMIT TO RANDOM URINALYSIS CURFEW 10 PM TO 6 AM, MAY BE MODIFIED FOR WORK SUBMIT BIOLOGICAL SPECIMEN FOR FDLE - DNA DATABANK PURSUANT TO F.S. 943.325 COURT WILL CONSIDER EARLY TERMINATION UPON SUCCESSFULL COMPLETION OF ALL SPECIAL CONDITIONS SEE COST SHEET FOR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS THIRTY DAYS TO FILE AN APPEAL JUDGE GILBERT A. SMITH, JR FROM CASE MANAGEMENT 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS FILED IN OPEN COURT (SEE 2019 CF 3977)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS~INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-SEE CASE #19CF3977A FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.6a; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less