This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/27/2020 at 14:17:26 (UTC).

NYSSA L PEREZ

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 NYSSA L PEREZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Defendants

NYSSA L PEREZ

Englewood, FL 34223

NYSSA LYNNETTE PEREZ

Englewood, FL 34223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GREGORY T HREBINKO

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

07/23/2020 - ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

05/14/2020 - ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

EXCEPTIONAL DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

02/13/2020 - EXCEPTIONAL DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

WAIVER OF COUNSEL/ WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/13/2020 - WAIVER OF COUNSEL/ WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

INFORMATION

01/31/2020 - INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF LETTER RE DEFENDANT SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION OF PRETRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 831694; Tender Amount: $55.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 826707; Tender Amount: $210.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF MODIFICATION OF DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketLETTER RECEIVED WITH PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 822614; Tender Amount: $55.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketLETTER RECEIVED WITH PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXCEPTIONAL DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF COUNSEL/ WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13a; Description: PETIT THEFT (LESS THAN $100-FIRST OFFENSE); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less