This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 15:59:42 (UTC).

NATHAN T WATERS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 NATHAN T WATERS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

NATHAN T WATERS

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH DAVIDS

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/30/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/16/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/30/2020 AT 08:30 AM

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

03/16/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/02/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

02/04/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/04/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/03/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/31/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/31/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/31/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing03/16/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/30/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE (DOMESTIC); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less