This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/17/2020 at 01:05:29 (UTC).

MICHAEL CRAIG ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MICHAEL CRAIG ALEXANDER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

MICHAEL CRAIG ALEXANDER

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:30 AM

02/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:30 AM

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

02/12/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

02/07/2020 - MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

02/07/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

02/04/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

02/04/2020 - MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * DO NOT RETURN TO SMOKE SHOP * *

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * DO NOT RETURN TO SMOKE SHOP * *

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Hearing02/07/2020 at 08:30AM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-B; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * DO NOT RETURN TO SMOKE SHOP * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less