This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 11:33:57 (UTC).

MARLENE E BENDER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MARLENE E BENDER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARLENE E BENDER

Parrish, FL 34219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VICTORIA GRAY

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/28/2020 - JUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION **PER SENTENCING ON 24TH OF FEBUARY 2020**

04/06/2020 - EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION **PER SENTENCING ON 24TH OF FEBUARY 2020**

ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION

04/02/2020 - ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION

ORDER OF PROBATION (COUNTS 1, 2)

03/23/2020 - ORDER OF PROBATION (COUNTS 1, 2)

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

02/24/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

02/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

02/04/2020 - CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

INFORMATION FILED

01/22/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRESTITUTION CHECK # 00334632 04/06/2020 IN THE AMOUNT OF $2.99 REMITTED TO VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION **PER SENTENCING ON 24TH OF FEBUARY 2020**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION (COUNTS 1, 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$116.49; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 813172; Tender Amount: $26.49;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$116.49; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 811488; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY, WAIVER OF RIGHTS FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAIVES COUNSEL STATE REPRESENTED BY LIMEECHA DUNBAR AS TO COUNTS I & II PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY PLACED ON PROBATION FOR 6 MONTHS CONCURRENT EACH COUNT COMPLETE 15 HOURS PUBLIC SERVICE WORK AS DIRECTED WITHIN 5 MONTHS ATTEND AND COMPLETE ANTI THEFT CLASS WITHIN 5 MONTHS NO RETURN TOD'LITES SHOPPE MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED AUTOMATIC EARLY TERMINATION UPON COMPLETION OF TERMS AND CONDITIONS JUDGE MARK D. SINGER ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketE-SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 810.08.12b; Description: TRESPASS IN OCCUPIED STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13a; Description: PETIT THEFT (LESS THAN $100); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less