This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:30:47 (UTC).

MARISOL MONDRAGON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MARISOL MONDRAGON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARISOL MONDRAGON

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBERT ELLIS GAIL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION. CHARGE(S) OF: (DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED (WITH: KNOWLEDGE - THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE) WILL BE REDUCED TO: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. PLEASE TRANSFER ALL PAPERWORK TO COUNTY COURT CASE # 2020CT000556AX.

02/11/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION. CHARGE(S) OF: (DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED (WITH: KNOWLEDGE - THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE) WILL BE REDUCED TO: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. PLEASE TRANSFER ALL PAPERWORK TO COUNTY COURT CASE # 2020CT000556AX.

BAD BOY BAIL BONDS - RSCCI - RSCCI - $1500

01/22/2020 - BAD BOY BAIL BONDS - RSCCI - RSCCI - $1500

COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

01/22/2020 - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

01/22/2020 - FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION. CHARGE(S) OF: (DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED (WITH: KNOWLEDGE - THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE) WILL BE REDUCED TO: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. PLEASE TRANSFER ALL PAPERWORK TO COUNTY COURT CASE # 2020CT000556AX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket**TRANSFERED TO TRAFFIC COURT CASE #2020CT000556**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketFLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION EXTRA COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAD BOY BAIL BONDS - RSCCI - RSCCI - $1500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 322.34.2b; Description: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELLED,SUSPENDED OR REVOKED AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION; Degree: First Degree; Citation: A4BWWLE;

    Read MoreRead Less