This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 01:08:21 (UTC).

LISA MARIE GEARGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LISA MARIE GEARGUIRRE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

LISA MARIE GEARGUIRRE

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOS NICHOLOUDIS

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY MICHELLE MEYER

 

Court Documents

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/24/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/24/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

03/18/2020 - RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

ORDER FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/18/2020 - ORDER FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/14/2020 AT 01:30 PM, DEFENDANT RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

03/17/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/14/2020 AT 01:30 PM, DEFENDANT RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD-MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3-26-2020 AT 1:30 PM, PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3-17-2020 AT 1:30 PM

03/04/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD-MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3-26-2020 AT 1:30 PM, PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3-17-2020 AT 1:30 PM

INFORMATION

03/03/2020 - INFORMATION

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT TO EVALUATE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED ( THIS CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR.A HEARING ON THE ISSUE OF THE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED AT 1:30 O'CLOCK P.M. ON THE 26TH DAY OF MARCH, 2020)

02/14/2020 - ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT TO EVALUATE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED ( THIS CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR.A HEARING ON THE ISSUE OF THE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED AT 1:30 O'CLOCK P.M. ON THE 26TH DAY OF MARCH, 2020)

SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

02/13/2020 - SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/06/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/04/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

02/03/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/03/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/03/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • Hearing04/14/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing03/26/2020 at 01:30PM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-B; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Hearing03/17/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/14/2020 AT 01:30 PM, DEFENDANT RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY: CHRISTOS NICHOLOUDIS, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY: LINDSEY MEYER DEFENDANT RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE ORDER FILED IN COURT JUDGE ROBERT A FARRANCE ENTERED VIA ICPS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EXPERT TO EVALUATE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED ( THIS CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR.A HEARING ON THE ISSUE OF THE DEFENDANT'S COMPETENCY TO PROCEED AT 1:30 O'CLOCK P.M. ON THE 26TH DAY OF MARCH, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.1a2a; Description: TRESPASS AFTER NOTICE ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less