This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/22/2020 at 07:52:49 (UTC).

LEONARDO E BROWN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 LEONARDO E BROWN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEONARDO E BROWN

Palmetto, FL 34221

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

01/22/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

01/22/2020 - PALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

01/22/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE / DEFENDANT PRESENT - WAIVES COUNSEL & FORMAL FILING OF THE INFORMATION STATE REPRESENTED BY ROBERT ELLIS GAIL PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO COUNTY JAIL WITH CREDIT TIME SERVED MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE DENO G ECONOMOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.2b; Description: TRESPASS AFTER WARNING - PROPERTY; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less