This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 16:20:54 (UTC).

LAQUIESHA SHAKUAL COLLINS

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 LAQUIESHA SHAKUAL COLLINS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

LAQUIESHA SHAKUAL COLLINS

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED.)

03/13/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED.)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/02/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

RETURNED MAIL: DEFENDANT'S COPY OF ORDER FILED 2-13-20

02/25/2020 - RETURNED MAIL: DEFENDANT'S COPY OF ORDER FILED 2-13-20

ORDER MODIFYING CONDITION OF THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM ( TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO HAVE CALL-IN APPOINTMENTS. )

02/13/2020 - ORDER MODIFYING CONDITION OF THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM ( TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO HAVE CALL-IN APPOINTMENTS. )

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

02/03/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/03/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/31/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/30/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/30/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/30/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/30/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing03/16/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/16/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: DEFENDANT'S COPY OF ORDER FILED 2-13-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER MODIFYING CONDITION OF THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM ( TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO HAVE CALL-IN APPOINTMENTS. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO COUNTY PROBATION/SROR (WITH RESPONSE FROM SUPERVISED RELEASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO COUNTY PROBATION/SUPERVISED RELEASE (REGARDING MODIFICATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF SROR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEFENDANT (REGARDING PRE TRIAL CONDITIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE (DOMESTIC); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less